Planning Board
Board Members
Name | Title |
---|---|
Donald Roberts | Chairman |
Marcel Nadeau | 1/1/22 - 12/31/28 |
Richard Berkowitz | 1/1/18 – 12/31/24 |
Thomas J. Koval | 1/1/21-12/31/27 |
Thomas Werner | 1/1/18-12/31/26 |
John Wasielewski | Board Co-Liaison |
Eric Catricala | |
Alison Pingelski | 01/04/2023 - 12/31/2025 |
Laurie Barton | 02/01/2023 - 12/31/2025 |
Charlie Lucia | 01/01/2023-12/31/2028 |